U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Transcript Purchase Order - Appeal]
  • January 31, 2022: [--Transcript]
  • January 04, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • December 29, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2021: [Bail Hearing - not revocation]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order for Jury Lunch]
  • August 30, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • August 30, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • August 30, 2021: [Jury Notes (Sealed)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • August 30, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 30, 2021: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • August 30, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • August 27, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • August 26, 2021: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • August 24, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • August 24, 2021: [Jury Trial Held]
  • August 20, 2021: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • August 17, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • August 16, 2021: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • August 16, 2021: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • August 06, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Opposition]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 28, 2021: [Take Deposition]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2021: [Status Report ]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 07, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Status Report ]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2020: [Jury Selection]
  • November 16, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • November 13, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • November 10, 2020: [Jury Instructions ]
  • November 10, 2020: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • November 09, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 06, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 06, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • November 04, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • October 30, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 30, 2020: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • October 16, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • October 13, 2020: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • October 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 02, 2020: [Status Report ]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Take Deposition]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 15, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 13, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 11, 2020: [Status Report ]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2020: [Status Report ]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 29, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • November 20, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • November 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Warrant ]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.