U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pozo Havero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • January 07, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 07, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • January 07, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 20, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 19, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • November 19, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • November 19, 2019: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.