U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez-Mendez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 14, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • January 14, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 26, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • November 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • November 26, 2019: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.