U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campusano Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 11, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 11, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 26, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • November 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.