U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00347
  • Case Name: Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Terminate Case - Misc. or MD]
  • April 03, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • March 02, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • March 02, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 02, 2020: [Deficiency re Redacted Documents]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Request for Oral Argument]
  • January 16, 2020: [Brief - Reply]
  • January 16, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 09, 2020: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [-SET ANSWERING BRIEF - no open brief w/ Motion]
  • December 26, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 26, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2019: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Service]
  • December 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 03, 2019: [Remark]
  • December 03, 2019: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.