U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quinn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Exit Record]
  • June 19, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 13, 2020: [Remark]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 06, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 04, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.