U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matthews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • February 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 18, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 25, 2020: [Exclude]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 29, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress Evidence]
  • July 01, 2020: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Response to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • May 18, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 04, 2020: [Suppress Evidence]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 05, 2020: [Remark]
  • February 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Detain Pending Trial]
  • December 19, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Writ Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • December 12, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • December 04, 2019: [Warrant ]
  • December 04, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 04, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.