U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chilel Niz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • January 31, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 31, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 31, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • January 31, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • December 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2019: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • December 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.