U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • September 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 27, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 25, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 13, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 21, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 18, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.