U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez-Mendez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 11, 2020: [Interpreter Requested]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 14, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Detain Pending Trial]
  • December 13, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • December 13, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.