U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santana-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2021: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • June 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 05, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • June 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 25, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • May 20, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • September 18, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • June 25, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 15, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 22, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 22, 2020: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • January 22, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • December 18, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 16, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • December 16, 2019: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.