U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Declaration]
  • January 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2021: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Remark]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Exclude]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 24, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 22, 2020: [Status Report ]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • December 18, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 16, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • December 16, 2019: [Criminal Complaint Unsealed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.