U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment -18:3582c2]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 22, 2022: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Declaration]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • September 13, 2021: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2021: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • April 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 13, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 15, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Redacted Document]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 26, 2020: [Exclude]
  • March 12, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • March 12, 2020: [Indictment]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 28, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 26, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • December 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 19, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • December 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.