U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Comer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 27, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2021: [Remark]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 09, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 13, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • October 09, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 16, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 11, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 15, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 14, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 08, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 08, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.