U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [--Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [--Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 15, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • February 14, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [--Transcript]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 22, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Remark]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 17, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2020: [Exclude]
  • November 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Opinion - Memorandum Opinion]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • June 02, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 14, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • May 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 04, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Suppress Evidence]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 19, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 23, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 16, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • January 09, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 09, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.