U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alicea-Roman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • August 20, 2021: [Exit Record]
  • August 20, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • December 14, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • September 15, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Remark]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Remark]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 15, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2020: [Status Report ]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 22, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • May 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 26, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2020: [Exclude]
  • March 26, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 03, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • January 15, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 09, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.