U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beasley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 09, 2022: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 30, 2022: [Seal]
  • June 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Declaration]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 21, 2021: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Remark]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 15, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • January 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 17, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • January 17, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • January 17, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • January 17, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.