open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00081
    Party Name:Airspan Networks Inc. v. Barkan Wireless IP Holdings, L.P.
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?71202
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =