U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera-Villa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 20, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • September 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • September 02, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2020: [Scheduling Conference - Deft. present]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 11, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 29, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 29, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • January 24, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.