U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguilar-Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Remark]
  • July 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 03, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 03, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • March 03, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 28, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.