U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00114-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Mercado et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 09, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • November 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 19, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 13, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • February 07, 2020: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • February 07, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.