U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Remark]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order]
  • July 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2020: [Oral Order]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 10, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 10, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • March 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 28, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • February 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 12, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 10, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.