U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romo-Campos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 14, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • May 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 14, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • May 14, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 19, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 13, 2020: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • February 13, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.