U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haugh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Remark]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 01, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 01, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 27, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 21, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • February 14, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • February 14, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • February 14, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.