U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bellamy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2020: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Suppress Evidence]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 27, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • February 14, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • February 14, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • February 14, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.