U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 14, 2020: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • May 14, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 17, 2020: [Oral Order]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • February 19, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 14, 2020: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • February 14, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.