open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00223
    Party Name:In re: US Investigations Services, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Non-Prisoner Pro Se IFP-Deficiency]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Teleconference]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bankruptcy Appeal - Notice of Docketing - Mediation]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bankruptcy Appeal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bankruptcy Appeal - No Designation of Record Filed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?71457
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =