U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ashley Houghton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 25, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Declaration]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 17, 2020: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • July 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • June 15, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order]
  • April 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 04, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 03, 2020: [Remark]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • February 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 27, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 27, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.