U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abreu-Sano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • May 26, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 26, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 26, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • May 26, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 21, 2020: [Remark]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • April 17, 2020: [Oral Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 04, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • February 28, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.