U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Motion - No Judicial Determination Requested]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
  • December 13, 2022: [Address updated]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 15, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion - No Judicial Determination Requested]
  • June 24, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • June 24, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • June 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2022: [Declaration]
  • June 08, 2022: [Affidavit]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • April 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • March 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
  • March 24, 2022: [Recusal]
  • March 24, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • March 17, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 14, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 10, 2022: [Affidavit]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • January 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 14, 2022: [Discovery]
  • January 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 02, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2021: [Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 27, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 18, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • August 05, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 01, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • April 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • April 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 22, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 10, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 22, 2021: [Remark]
  • February 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 05, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 01, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 01, 2021: [Seal Document]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 28, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 25, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • January 25, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • December 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 15, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 02, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2020: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
  • October 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 24, 2020: [Letter]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • March 03, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.