U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Juan Jose Guante et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2020: [Remark]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Remark]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 15, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 15, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • July 15, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.