U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lozano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 22, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • May 22, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • May 22, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • May 22, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • May 22, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 21, 2020: [Remark]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 27, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 11, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 10, 2020: [Speedy Trial - Waive Speedy Trial]
  • March 10, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.