U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 03, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • December 03, 2020: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • December 03, 2020: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 20, 2020: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • April 20, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • April 20, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.