U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 12, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 01, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • June 16, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 11, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arrest - Prob/Superv. Release Violation Only]
  • May 27, 2021: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • May 27, 2021: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 20, 2020: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • April 20, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.