open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00689
    Party Name:LiTL LLC v. Lenovo(United States), Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued - Electronic Service]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?72233
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =