U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jarvela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Declaration]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 29, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 02, 2021: [Exclude]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 30, 2021: [Exclude]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Exclude]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 27, 2021: [Exclude]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 29, 2021: [Exclude]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Exclude]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Exclude]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 09, 2020: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [Remark]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • May 27, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.