U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Declaration]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 28, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • August 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arraignment - Guilty Plea]
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Information - Felony]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 14, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 04, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • June 04, 2021: [Exclude]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 16, 2021: [Exclude]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2021: [Exclude]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 15, 2021: [Exclude]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2020: [Exclude]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Exclude]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 21, 2020: [Exclude]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 18, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 08, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 27, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 27, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • May 27, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.