U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Delgado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: [Remark]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • February 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 25, 2021: [Status Report ]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2020: [Status Report ]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 10, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • June 24, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.