open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00886
    Party Name:Actifio, Inc. v. Rubrik, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit to a Document]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appendix]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued - Electronic Service]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?72584
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =