U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2022: [Forfeiture - Final Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [--Transcript]
  • August 04, 2022: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Declaration]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [- - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit]
  • April 22, 2022: [- NOTICE OF APPEAL- Final Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • March 23, 2022: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 04, 2021: [Brady Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • September 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • June 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • July 30, 2020: [Writ Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • July 24, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • July 07, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.