U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • June 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2021: [Status Report ]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2021: [Status Report ]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 09, 2021: [Status Report ]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 23, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 23, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 21, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Arrest ]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • July 07, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.