U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McInosh et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 30, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 30, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 30, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • July 24, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • July 15, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 14, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • July 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Indictment]
  • July 07, 2020: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.