U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acevedo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2021: [Remark]
  • August 02, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • March 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Requested]
  • March 23, 2021: [Interpreter Requested]
  • March 16, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 08, 2021: [Exclude]
  • March 08, 2021: [Status Report ]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2021: [Exclude]
  • January 08, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2020: [Exclude]
  • November 23, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 25, 2020: [Exclude]
  • September 25, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 23, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.