U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • January 17, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 07, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 30, 2022: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • November 30, 2022: [Verdict Sheet - Proposed]
  • November 30, 2022: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • November 23, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Bifurcate]
  • November 21, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2021: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2021: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 16, 2020: [Remark]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • July 30, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 29, 2020: [Detain Pending Trial]
  • July 23, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 22, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • July 17, 2020: [Warrant ]
  • July 17, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • July 17, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.