U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barndt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Mail Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • June 28, 2021: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order - Memorandum and Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Reply to the Response to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2020: [Address updated]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • July 22, 2020: [Release from Custody]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.