open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:20-cv-01051
    Party Name:Uniloc 2017 LLC v. NEXON CO, LTD et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Local Counsel Letter]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In from other District - Case Opening Event]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?72883
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =