open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:20-11931-
    Party Name:RGN-Fort Lauderdale III, LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [Order-Joint Admin]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [none]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [Request for Certification of Document (fee)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [Telephonic 341 Meeting Information]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [Request to Schedule Section 341 Meeting]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Songonuga, Natasha M. [SBRA - Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Telephonic 341 Meeting Information]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request to Schedule Section 341 Meeting]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Add Attorney]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [SBRA - Order Setting Status Conference]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [none]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.deb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?182248
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =