U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DiFelice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [--Transcript]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • December 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Remark]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • November 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 16, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • October 14, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 02, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 14, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • August 14, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.