U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pendergrass
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 10, 2022: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • February 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • September 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • September 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2021: [Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2021: [Exclude]
  • March 25, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Remark]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 23, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • September 03, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Produce]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 17, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • August 17, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • August 17, 2020: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.