U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 20, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.